WebTerrence Thomas Prendergast SJ is a Canadian member of the Society of Jesus who is also a prelate of the Roman Catholic Church and the Archbishop Emeritus of Ottawa … WebTerrence Thomas Prendergast, SJ (born 19 February 1944) is the Archbishop of Ottawa, Canada. [1] He was formerly the Archbishop of Halifax. Prior to that he was the titular (in title only) Bishop of Slebte and Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto. [2] Early life [ change change source] Prendergast was born in Montreal. [1]
Prendergast’s retirement on hold - The Catholic Register
WebAfter consulting with local Catholics, it was decided the two dioceses would be kept separate, but united by having Ottawa’s Archbishop Terrence Prendergast serve as Alexandria-Cornwall’s bishop, with the help of an auxiliary bishop who will live in the region. During his blessing at Desrochers’ ordination on Friday, Prendergast said ... WebAug 31, 2024 · Prendergast finally off into retirement. Environmental stewardship is a value Archbishop Terrence Prendergast has held near and dear to his heart during his … sia and co
Archdiocese of Toronto - Most Reverend Terrence Prendergast
WebDec 4, 2024 · Pope Francis accepted Friday the resignation of 76-year-old Canadian Archbishop Terrence Prendergast, S.J. The pope confirmed Dec. 4 that Archbishop Marcel Damphousse, 57, would succeed... Web14 May 2007 Appointed Archbishop of Ottawa 13 Jan 2016 Appointed Apostolic Administrator of Alexandria-Cornwall Terrence Prendergast was born in Montreal on February 19, 1944. After attending local Catholic schools, he entered the Jesuit Order on August 14, 1961. Terrence Thomas Prendergast SJ (born 19 February 1944) is a Canadian member of the Society of Jesus who is also a prelate of the Roman Catholic Church and the Archbishop Emeritus of Ottawa-Cornwall. He was formerly an Auxiliary Bishop of the Archdiocese of Toronto and the Archbishop of Halifax. On 6 … See more A native of Montreal, Prendergast was born in 1944, one of five children. He entered the Jesuit novitiate in 1961 and was ordained a priest in 1972. He holds a Bachelor of Arts degree from Fordham University, … See more Pope John Paul II named Prendergast the Titular Bishop of Slebte and an Auxiliary Bishop of the Archdiocese of Toronto on 22 February 1995. He … See more After serving on the Canadian Bishops' Commission for Relations with Associations of Clergy, Consecrated Life and Laity, as a member of the CCCB Theology … See more sia and husband